House | 03/05/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Filed |