Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1153 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/03/2024

                               
 
HB 1153  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1153-00 
Page 1 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to advanced wastewater treatment ; 2 
providing legislative findings; requiring the 3 
Department of Environmental Protection, in 4 
consultation with the water management districts and 5 
sewage disposal facilities, to submit to the Governor 6 
and Legislature, by specified dates, reports on 7 
certain permitted sewage disposal facilities in the 8 
state, a priority ranking process for implementing 9 
advanced wastewater treatment upgrades at such 10 
facilities, and the implementation status of such 11 
upgrades; providing an effective date. 12 
 13 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 14 
 15 
 Section 1.  (1)  The Legislature finds that the discharge 16 
of inadequately treated wastewater and aging sewage disposal 17 
facilities compromise the quality of the environment, including 18 
freshwater, brackish water, and nearshore and offshore salt 19 
waters, and threatens the quality of life and local economies in 20 
the state that depend on those resources. The Legislature also 21 
finds that the only practical and cost -effective way to 22 
fundamentally improve wastewater management is to require 23 
advanced wastewater treatment or better at all sewage disposal 24 
facilities with a permitted capacity of greater than 1 million 25     
 
HB 1153  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1153-00 
Page 2 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
gallons per day in the state. 26 
 (2)  In order to prioritize the upgrade of sewage disposal 27 
facilities, by December 31, 2024, the Department of 28 
Environmental Protection, in consultation with the water 29 
management districts and wastew ater facilities, shall submit to 30 
the Governor, the President of the Senate, and the Speaker of 31 
the House of Representatives a report detailing all of the 32 
following for all sewage disposal facilities with a permitted 33 
capacity of greater than 1 million gallo ns per day in the state: 34 
 (a)  Year of construction for the facility and any 35 
maintenance or upgrades. 36 
 (b)  Total permitted volume of water treated daily. 37 
 (c)  Actual permitted volume of water treated daily over 38 
the most recent 1 year and 5 year averages. 39 
 (d)  Current level of treatment, including concentrations 40 
for each of the following: 41 
 1.  Biochemical oxygen demand. 42 
 2.  Suspended solids. 43 
 3.  Total nitrogen. 44 
 4.  Total phosphorus. 45 
 5.  1,4-dioxane. 46 
 6.  Perfluorooctanoic acid. 47 
 7.  Perfluorooctanesulfonic acid. 48 
 8.  Molybdenum. 49 
 9.  Other contaminants of emerging concern as determined by 50     
 
HB 1153  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1153-00 
Page 3 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
the department. 51 
 (e)  Estimated total pollutant loading based on permitted 52 
volume and concentrations. 53 
 (f)  Disposal methods and the volume discharg ed to any 54 
receiving waterbodies, if applicable, pursuant to s. 55 
403.064(17), Florida Statutes. 56 
 (g)  Impairment status of any receiving waterbodies within 57 
the watershed. 58 
 (h)  Implementation status of total maximum daily loads and 59 
basin management action pl ans and recommended reductions for 60 
load allocations and wasteload allocations for pollutants of 61 
concern. 62 
 (i)  Total volume and concentration of any permitted and 63 
nonpermitted wastewater spills since 2010. 64 
 (3)  By December 31, 2025, the department, in con sultation 65 
with the water management districts and sewage disposal 66 
facilities, shall submit to the Governor, the President of the 67 
Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives a report 68 
outlining a priority ranking process to upgrade all sewage 69 
disposal facilities in the state to advanced waste treatment by 70 
2035, based on all of the following: 71 
 (a)  Overall environmental benefit of a project based on: 72 
 1.  Water quality in receiving waterbodies, including 73 
impairment status; 74 
 2.  Severity and duration of documented algal blooms; 75     
 
HB 1153  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1153-00 
Page 4 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 3.  Loss of submerged vegetation; 76 
 4.  Death of fish and wildlife; 77 
 5.  Public health advisories; 78 
 6.  Quantity and concentration of permitted and 79 
nonpermitted spills; and 80 
 7.  Risk of failure. 81 
 (b)  Estimated reductio n in nutrient and pollutant loads 82 
with advanced waste treatment. 83 
 (c)  An explanation of additional projects necessary to 84 
meet any adopted total maximum daily loads and basin management 85 
action plans if upgrading to advanced treatment is not 86 
sufficient. 87 
 (d)  Cost-effectiveness as determined by a planning -level 88 
cost estimate. 89 
 (e)  Potential financial assistance available, including 90 
the water quality improvement grant program under s. 403.0673, 91 
Florida Statutes, and availability of local matching funds. 92 
 (f) Project readiness and the estimated date of 93 
completion. 94 
 (4)  By June 30, 2026, the department, in consultation with 95 
the water management districts and sewage disposal facilities, 96 
shall submit to the Governor, President of the Senate, and 97 
Speaker of the House of Representatives a progress report on the 98 
status of upgrades established under subsection (3) for each 99 
sewage disposal facility with a permitted capacity of greater 100     
 
HB 1153  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1153-00 
Page 5 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
than 1 million gallons per day in the state. The report must 101 
include a list of the sewage disposal facilities with a 102 
permitted capacity of greater than 1 million gallons per day 103 
required to upgrade to advanced wastewater treatment, the 104 
preliminary cost estimates for the upgrades, a projected 105 
timeline of the dates by which the upgrades wi ll begin and be 106 
completed, and the date by which operations of the upgraded 107 
sewage disposal facility will begin. 108 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2024. 109