Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1163 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024