House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Original reference removed: Select Committee on Health Innovation
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|