Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024