House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|