|
04/29/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-131
|
|
|
|
04/26/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/16/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 353898 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (353898)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for SB 1618
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|