House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Filed |