Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024