House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Filed |