House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|