House | 03/08/2024 | Died on Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Filed |