Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024