Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024