Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1461 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024