Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 32
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Original reference removed: Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|