House
|
02/29/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1350
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Substituted CS/SB 1350
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2024
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|