|
04/16/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-99
|
|
|
|
04/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 656380 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (656380)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1662
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|