Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024