Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1579 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024