Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5003 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 14, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 14, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024