Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5301 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024