Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024