House | 03/08/2024 | Died on Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Filed |