03/22/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-40 | |||
03/22/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
03/19/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 02/01/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Substituted for SB 7012 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Received | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/23/2024) | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 11/17/2023 | Filed |