House | 03/04/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Filed |