House | 03/05/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Favorable with CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Filed |