House | 03/04/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Filed |