|
05/08/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-158; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 328 (Ch. 2024-188)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/07/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Amendment 635570 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (635570)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 7074
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 88, NAYS 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 122247 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 305937 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 164711 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 328313 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 765439 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 346991 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|