06/03/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-225; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1582 (Ch. 2024-246) | |||
05/31/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/21/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 03/06/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Substituted for SB 7070 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Received | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Filed |