Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Now in Transportation | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 12/06/23, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Transportation; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Filed |