Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill December 6, 2023