Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 12/06/23, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 09/18/2023 | Filed |