Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules | ||
Senate | 09/18/2023 | Filed |