|
04/03/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-46
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|