Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 09/25/2023 | Filed |