Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis December 7, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill December 7, 2023