02/21/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-2 | |||
02/15/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
02/08/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Substituted for HB 7029 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/17/2024) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/10/24 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 12/04/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 12/13/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Filed |