Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024