Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/20/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Filed |