Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 30, 2024