|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-164
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|