Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Agriculture | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Now in Agriculture | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Agriculture; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Filed |