Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 437
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 437
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|