Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0208 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024