LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0216
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0216
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0216
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 18, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
February 22, 2024
Analysis
February 21, 2024
Analysis
February 8, 2024
Analysis
February 7, 2024
Analysis
January 9, 2024
Analysis
January 8, 2024