Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Filed |