Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis December 13, 2023
Analysis December 12, 2023