Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/22/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/20/2023 | Filed |