Senate | 02/22/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 317 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Substituted HB 317 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/24 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Filed |